RI H7213 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adds tutoring to the list of occupations which may be performed at a state college or university by a retired public officer or employee without forfeiture or impairment of retirement benefits, subject to an annual limitation of $18,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement System--contributions And Benefits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-05HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-06-01HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2018)
2018-01-18HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback