RI H7212 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the replacement of original equipment from manufacturer front light lamps that project a beam of light greater than the intensity of the original lamps.
Title
Lighting Equipment
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/04/2020) |
2020-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7212.pdf |