RI H7207 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits surveillance on any public highway in the state unless specifically authorized by statute or court order. This act would also provide for the confidentiality of information collected or stored.
Title
Surveillance Devices
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2016) |
2016-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7207.pdf |