RI H7206 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends Coventry's sewer system enabling legislation to allow appropriations from town tax fund for wastewater system sewers/projects only after voter approval.
Title
Relating To An Amendment Of Chapter 330 Of The Public Laws Of 1997 Entitled "to Create A Sewer Authority For The Town Of Coventry And To Authorize Said Town To Plan, Construct, Finance, Operate And Maintain Sewage Works"
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Nunes [D] | Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] | Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018) |
2018-04-12 | House | Committee transferred to House Municipal Government |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7206.pdf |