RI H7196 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the definition of firearms to include tasers, as well as define taser and stun gun.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] |
Rep. George Nardone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2022) |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7196.pdf |