RI H7196 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Increases the amount of purchases the North Providence's purchasing agent may purchase an item, without bid, from $1,500 to $2,500.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending The Charter Of North Providence

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2018-05-10HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-10SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/10/2018)
2018-04-25HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-04-18HousePlaced on House Calendar (04/25/2018)
2018-04-05HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for consideration (04/05/2018)
2018-03-28HouseHouse voted to recommit to House Municipal Government
2018-03-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/28/2018)
2018-03-01HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-02-19HouseScheduled for consideration (03/01/2018)
2018-02-08HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2018)
2018-01-18HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback