RI H7194 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-23 - Senate passed in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires driver's instruction courses and tests to include instruction information on driver's responsible conduct and rights during a traffic stop.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver Education Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-22SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-22SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/22/2018)
2018-05-31SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-05-22HouseHouse read and passed
2018-05-18HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/22/2018)
2018-05-09HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-04HouseScheduled for consideration (05/09/2018)
2018-03-27HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-23HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018)
2018-03-20HouseMeeting postponed (03/21/2018)
2018-03-16HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-01-18HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback