RI H7193 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that any person, including, but not limited to, a minor who is pregnant, could give effective consent for medical, dental, health and hospital services relating to prenatal, delivery, and post-delivery care.
Title
Consent To Medical And Surgical Care
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] |
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-22 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-06-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-22 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-06 | House | Meeting postponed (06/06/2018) |
2018-06-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2018-02-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2018) |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |