RI H7190 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that sealers of weights and measures appointed by the cities and towns receive the same fees as charged by state sealers who perform the same inspecting/testing services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Produce Scales In Markets

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseSigned by Governor
2018-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-22HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-21HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-21HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-21HouseScheduled for consideration (06/21/2018)
2018-03-22HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-16HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2018)
2018-02-25HouseCommittee transferred to House Municipal Government
2018-02-25HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (02/27/2018)
2018-02-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-06HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor
2018-02-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2018)
2018-01-17HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback