RI H7182 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the use of restraints on pregnant prisoners in their third trimester during transport to and from court proceedings by sheriffs and/or incarceration at the ACI with annual reports to the general assembly effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Healthy Pregnancies For Incarcerated Women Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseSigned by Governor
2018-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-21SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-21SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/21/2018)
2018-06-20HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-19HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-06-16HouseScheduled for consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-02-06HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2018)
2018-01-17HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback