RI H7182 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the use of restraints on pregnant prisoners in their third trimester during transport to and from court proceedings by sheriffs and/or incarceration at the ACI with annual reports to the general assembly effective January 1, 2019.
Title
The Healthy Pregnancies For Incarcerated Women Act
Sponsors
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Moira Walsh [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-02-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2018) |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |