RI H7176 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides a scholarship allowing a student in the care and custody of the DCYF to attend RIC without the payment of tuition and room and board as long as they meet the eligibility requirements of the program and the admission criteria of RIC.
Title
Rhode Island Department Of Children, Youth And Families Scholarship Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2022) |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7176.pdf |