RI H7171 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the trapping and release of unowned feral cats for the purpose of spaying or neutering.
Title
Relating To Animals And Animal Husbandry
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. David Coughlin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
2018-05-03 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/03/2018) |
2018-04-04 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-04-02 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/04/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2018) |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |