RI H7165 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Insurance - Autism Spectrum Disorders (would Include Coverage For Psychology, Psychiatry And Pharmaceutical Services.)
Title
An Act Relating To Insurance - Autism Spectrum Disorders (would Include Coverage For Psychology, Psychiatry And Pharmaceutical Services.)
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Richard Morrison [D] | Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
Rep. Peter Palumbo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-15 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-12 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-06-12 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2012-06-12 | House passed Sub A | |
2012-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-06 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-06-04 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2012) | |
2012-02-08 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-02-03 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2012) | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7165.pdf |