RI H7155 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-24 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/26/2022)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-24 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/26/2022)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the interstate nurse licensure compact and adopts an enhanced and more comprehensive version of the compact, to allow nurses to hold a multi-state license allowing them to practice across state lines without having to obtain multiple licenses.
Title
Nurse Licensure Compact
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-24 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/26/2022) |
2022-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7155.pdf |