RI H7148 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a tiered-rate structure for the child care assistance program, with higher rates paid to licensed child care centers and family child care homes that have achieved higher quality ratings in "BrightStars".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Care - State Subsidies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2018)
2018-01-12HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback