RI H7148 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a tiered-rate structure for the child care assistance program, with higher rates paid to licensed child care centers and family child care homes that have achieved higher quality ratings in "BrightStars".
Title
Child Care - State Subsidies
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2018) |
2018-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7148.pdf |