RI H7147 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- CURRICULUM - Requires the department of education to develop and make available for use in all schools a mental health curriculum. School districts would be required to provide four (4) hours of mental health instruction to seventh grade students.
Title
Requires the department of education to develop and make available for use in all schools a mental health curriculum. School districts would be required to provide four (4) hours of mental health instruction to seventh grade students.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Leonela Felix [D] |
Rep. Brianna Henries [D] | Rep. Jennifer Stewart [D] | Rep. Cherie Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-01-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/31/2024) |
2024-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7147.pdf |