RI H7144 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

INSURANCE -- COVID-19 PANDEMIC INSURANCE RECOVERY ACT - Allows businesses that had an insurance policy in place for business interruption as of March 9, 2020 or thereafter to recover from their insurance companies for a COVID-19 business impact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows businesses that had an insurance policy in place for business interruption as of March 9, 2020 or thereafter to recover from their insurance companies for a COVID-19 business impact.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-25HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2024-01-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/25/2024)
2024-01-11HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback