RI H7143 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities -- Audit Of Accounts And Installation Of Systems (would Create A Uniform System Of Auditing For Municipal Finances.)
Title
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities -- Audit Of Accounts And Installation Of Systems (would Create A Uniform System Of Auditing For Municipal Finances.)
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Brien [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. Peter Martin [D] |
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-16 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2012) | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7143.pdf |