RI H7142 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/25/2018)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/25/2018)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Rhode Island Livable Home Tax Credit Act", and would provide for its administration.
Title
Rhode Island Livable Home Tax Credit Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/25/2018) |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7142.pdf |