RI H7140 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for immunity provisions for persons involved in donating feminine hygiene products to charitable or nonprofit organizations.
Title
Feminine Hygiene Product Donation Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-24 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2022-05-05 | House | House read and passed |
2022-04-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/05/2022) |
2022-04-13 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/13/2022) |
2022-01-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-01-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/25/2022) |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |