RI H7133 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the creation and implementation of a Pharmaceutical Redistribution program by the department of health (DOH) and the board of pharmacy to commence operations on January 1, 2023.
Title
Pharmaceutical Redistribution Program Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] |
Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-24 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - Passage (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 10 N: 52 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-03 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 9 N: 52 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - Passage (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 10 N: 52 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-03 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 9 N: 52 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | House passed Sub B in concurrence |
2022-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2022-05-03 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-04-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/03/2022) |
2022-04-26 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-04-22 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-04-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/26/2022) |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2022) |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |