RI H7131 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts residential water customers over sixty-five (65) from paying surcharges on their basic water supply rate.
Title
Water Suppliers
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-01-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/30/2018) |
2018-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7131.pdf |