RI H7127 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Grants the town council of the town of Narragansett the authority to adopt a homestead exemption ordinance.
Title
Homestead Exemption In The Town Of Narragansett
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-09 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - Passage (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - Passage (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-06-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/09/2016) |
2016-05-31 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-05-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/31/2016) |
2016-05-26 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/26/2016) |
2016-05-19 | House | Meeting postponed (05/19/2016) |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/25/2016) |
2016-01-27 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (01/28/2016) |
2016-01-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |