RI H7125 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides protections for consumers and small businesses in the areas of insurance, real estate and accountancy.
Title
Business Regulation
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-17 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-09 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-07-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2016) |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2016-05-17 | House | House read and passed |
2016-05-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/17/2016) |
2016-05-03 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-04-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/03/2016) |
2016-02-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-01-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/03/2016) |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |