RI H7124 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a social media privacy policy for students and employees.
Title
Social Media Privacy
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] | Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] |
Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | House | House passed Sub B in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2014) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-04-02 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-03-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/02/2014) |
2014-03-12 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-03-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/12/2014) |
2014-03-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2014) |
2014-01-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |