RI H7122 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the trapping and subsequent release of any unowned feral or free roaming cat for the purpose of spaying or neutering of the cat shall not be considered abandonment.
Title
Relating To Animals And Animal Husbandry
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | House read and passed |
2020-02-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/04/2020) |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2020-02-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/27/2020) |
2020-02-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2020) |
2020-01-30 | House | Committee transferred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |