RI H7119 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes a one-half (1/2) fee waiver to pay one-half (1/2) the costs of teachers in obtaining an International Dyslexia Association aligned graduate certificate in dyslexia knowledge and practice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

International Dyslexia Association Certification - Partial Fee Waiver

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-09HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2018)
2018-02-07HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2018)
2018-01-11HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback