RI H7116 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits an employer from inquiring about a prospective employee wage and salary history before an offer of employment with compensation has been extended.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unlawful Employment Practices

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-16HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2018)
2018-01-11HouseIntroduced, referred to House Labor

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback