RI H7115 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- OPEN MEETINGS - Provides that public bodies not be required to hold open-forum sessions on any topic not on the meeting notice and limits comment on any topic not previously posted.
Title
Provides that public bodies not be required to hold open-forum sessions on any topic not on the meeting notice and limits comment on any topic not previously posted.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2024) |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7115.pdf |