RI H7110 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a child, who is in foster care on their eighteenth (18th) birthday may voluntarily elect to continue responsibility for care and placement from DCYF and to remain under the legal supervision of the court until age twenty-one (21).
Title
Proceedings In Family Court--voluntary Extension Of Care Act
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2018) |
2018-01-23 | House | Meeting postponed (01/24/2018) |
2018-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7110.pdf |