RI H7104 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits persons with felony records to petition the court to have their court records, where there has been dismissal/no true bill/no information or if the person has otherwise been exonerated from the offense, sealed by the clerk of the court.
Title
Identification And Apprehension Of Criminals
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
Rep. June Speakman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2020) |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7104.pdf |