RI H7103 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that applications to purchase firearms be sent by the seller to the police department the city or town where the purchaser lives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Weapons--the Julie Lynn Cardinal Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-13 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Offenses - weapons approval of amendment lc 003663/5 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - The julie lynn cardinal act approval of amendment (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22SenateSigned by Governor
2020-07-17SenateTransmitted to Governor
2020-07-16HouseHouse passed Sub B as amended in concurrence
2020-07-14HousePlaced on House Calendar (07/16/2020)
2020-07-13SenateSenate passed Sub B as amended (floor amendment)
2020-07-10SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (07/13/2020)
2020-06-18SenateSenate held on desk
2020-06-17SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/18/2020)
2020-06-17HouseHouse passed Sub B as amended (floor amendment)
2020-06-15HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/17/2020)
2020-06-10HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub B as amended
2020-06-08HouseScheduled for consideration (06/10/2020)
2020-03-11HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2020-03-10SenateSenate passed Sub B as amended (floor amendment)
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (03/10/2020)
2020-03-03SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub B
2020-03-02SenateProposed Substitute
2020-02-28SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2020)
2020-02-25SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2020-02-06HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2020-02-04HousePlaced on House Calendar (02/06/2020)
2020-01-28HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2020-01-24HouseProposed Substitute
2020-01-24HouseScheduled for consideration (01/28/2020)
2020-01-22HouseCommittee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
2020-01-22HouseCommittee recommended indefinite postponement
2020-01-20HouseProposed Substitute
2020-01-20HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/22/2020)
2020-01-15HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://status.rilin.state.ri.us/
Texthttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText20/HouseText20/H7103.pdf
Texthttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText20/HouseText20/H7103A.pdf
Texthttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText20/HouseText20/H7103Aaa.pdf
Texthttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText20/HouseText20/H7103B.pdf
Texthttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText20/HouseText20/H7103Baa.pdf
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=16951
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=16950
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=12617
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=12616
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=12695
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=12696

Bill Comments

feedback