RI H7099 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Insurance (would Provide That A Health Benefit Plan Issued To A Small Employer With An Aggregate Number Of At Least 100 Insured Individuals Be Exempt From The Provisions Of The Small Employer Health Insurance Availability Act.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Insurance (would Provide That A Health Benefit Plan Issued To A Small Employer With An Aggregate Number Of At Least 100 Insured Individuals Be Exempt From The Provisions Of The Small Employer Health Insurance Availability Act.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-29 Committee recommended measure be held for further study
2012-02-20 Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/29/2012)
2012-01-11 Introduced, referred to House Small Business

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback