RI H7098 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow proof of financial responsibility to be provided using a mobile electronic device
Title
Vehicle Insurance
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Helio Melo [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
Rep. Larry Valencia [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-04-16 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-04-15 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/16/2014) |
2014-04-10 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-04-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/10/2014) |
2014-03-25 | House | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2014-03-06 | House | House read and passed |
2014-03-04 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/06/2014) |
2014-03-04 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-02-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/04/2014) |
2014-02-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/04/2014) |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |