RI H7094 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits commercial vehicles from operating on Chases Lane in the town of Middletown and provides for fines for violations.
Title
Size, Weight, And Load Limits -- Commercial Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/03/2022) |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2022) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2022-03-29 | House | House read and passed |
2022-03-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/29/2022) |
2022-03-22 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-03-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/22/2022) |
2022-01-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-01-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/18/2022) |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |