RI H7094 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the executive office of health and human services to increase income disregards for certain Medicare programs.
Title
Medical Assistance
Sponsors
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Joy Hearn [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2018) |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7094.pdf |