RI H7090 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends provisions of an existing collective bargaining agreement for municipal police arbitration purposes until a successor agreement is reached or an interest arbitration award is rendered.
Title
Municipal Police Arbitration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/02/2022) |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7090.pdf |