RI H7090 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that any person held in prison for a charge upon which bail may be denied, shall be bailed or discharged if not indicted or charged by way of information within three months after commitment.
Title
Bail And Recognizance
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Christopher Millea [D] |
Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/28/2020) |
2020-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7090.pdf |