RI H7090 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-23 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Makes persons seventy (70) years of age or older eligible for exemption from jury service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procedure Generally - Jury Lists

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-23HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-23HouseScheduled for consideration (06/23/2018)
2018-01-24HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-01-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/24/2018)
2018-01-10HouseCommittee transferred to House Judiciary
2018-01-10HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback