RI H7086 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enables innocent persons who have been wrongfully convicted of a crime to petition the presiding justice of the superior court for an award of compensation and damages.
Title
Relating To Criminal Procedure
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] |
Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | House | House read and passed |
2020-02-07 | House | Placed on House Calendar (02/11/2020) |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2020-01-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/04/2020) |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/29/2020) |
2020-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |