RI H7084 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that payment orders issued by the court would not enter unless certain procedures required by the court regarding determining a defendant's ability to pay are considered.
Title
Costs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/10/2022) |
2022-01-22 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (01/25/2022) |
2022-01-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7084.pdf |