RI H7082 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2018)
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Hearing: May 24 Senate Health and Human Services Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires all hospitals and freestanding ambulatory surgical facilities to adopt policies to use a smoke evacuation system for surgical procedures that generate surgical smoke.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensing Of Health Care Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2018)
2018-03-27SenateReferred to Senate Health and Human Services
2018-03-14HouseHouse read and passed
2018-03-09HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/14/2018)
2018-02-28HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-02-19HouseScheduled for consideration (02/28/2018)
2018-02-14HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-09HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2018)
2018-01-10HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback