RI H7081 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that all cosmetics manufactured, sold, delivered, or held for offering to be sold contain a label that completely and accurately lists all of its component ingredient.
Title
Food, Drugs, And Cosmetic Labeling
Sponsors
Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Liana Cassar [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] |
Rep. Jose Batista [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/03/2022) |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7081.pdf |