RI H7081 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Historian Laureate Of Rhode Island (would Establish The Position Of Historian Laureate In Rhode Island.)
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Historian Laureate Of Rhode Island (would Establish The Position Of Historian Laureate In Rhode Island.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Referred to House H.E.W. | |
2012-05-01 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2012-04-26 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/01/2012) | |
2012-04-25 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-04-19 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2012) | |
2012-04-12 | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs | |
2012-02-15 | House read and passed | |
2012-02-09 | Placed on House Calendar (02/15/2012) | |
2012-02-08 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-02-03 | Scheduled for consideration (02/08/2012) | |
2012-02-01 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-01-30 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/01/2012) | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7081.pdf |