RI H7080 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes the fair employment practices act expressly applicable to individuals elected to state public officer or any political subdivision thereof and provides civil liability for person who directly or indirectly violates the chapter.
Title
Fair Employment Practices And The General Assembly
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Christopher Millea [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/29/2020) |
2020-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7080.pdf |