RI H7079 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that if state employee unions are engaged in contract negotiations and/or utilizing the dispute resolution process, all terms and conditions in the collective bargaining agreement shall continue to remain in effect.
Title
Organization Of State Employees
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Rep. Christopher Millea [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/29/2020) |
2020-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7079.pdf |