RI H7076 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Internet service providers to follow Internet service neutrality requirements.
Title
Internet Service Providers - Net Neutrality
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2018) |
2018-03-12 | House | Meeting postponed (03/13/2018) |
2018-03-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7076.pdf |