RI H7075 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Makes possession bump stocks, binary triggers or trigger cranks punishable by up to10 years in imprisonment and/or a $10,000 fine and penalizes modification of semi-automatic weapons to full automatic fire with a single pull or hold in the same way.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Weapons

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-12 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-04-12HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2018-04-10HousePlaced on House Calendar (04/12/2018)
2018-04-10HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-04-06HouseScheduled for consideration (04/10/2018)
2018-03-06HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2018)
2018-01-10HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback